TX HB3766 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the storage of grapes in a public warehouse.
Title
Relating to the storage of grapes in a public warehouse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-23 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1939 |
2019-04-17 | House | Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-10 | House | Postponed 4/17/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1939 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19