TX HB3855 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Bexar Metropolitan Water District.
Title
Relating to the Bexar Metropolitan Water District.
Sponsors
Rep. John Garza [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-04-18 | Read first time | |
2011-04-15 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Filed |
Subjects
BEXAR METROPOLITAN WATER DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB3855 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB03855I.htm |