TX HB3876 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 530; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 530; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-05 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2013-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-18 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2013-03-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HARRIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 530
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB3876 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB03876I.htm |