TX HB3890 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to protecting certain rights of members of the state military forces.
Title
Relating to protecting certain rights of members of the state military forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-01 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |