TX HB3893 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the modification of a 99-year lease of certain state property to the City of Austin and the grant of a 99-year lease of certain state property and certain easements to the Capital Metropolitan Transportation Authority.
Title
Relating to the modification of a 99-year lease of certain state property to the City of Austin and the grant of a 99-year lease of certain state property and certain easements to the Capital Metropolitan Transportation Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. James Talarico [D] |
Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#747 (Y: 117 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#747 |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended 1-Cyrier |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1838 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
SB1838 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
SB1838 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
AUSTIN, CITY OF
CAPITAL METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
CAPITAL METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit