TX HB3893 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to meetings of the board of directors of the Gulf Coast Authority.
Title
Relating to meetings of the board of directors of the Gulf Coast Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#681 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2336 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Local Government
SB2336 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Local Government
SB2336 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
GULF COAST AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING