TX HB3914 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation or dissolution of certain special districts; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose an assessment, fee, or tax.
Title
Relating to the creation or dissolution of certain special districts; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose an assessment, fee, or tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - HB 3914Third Reading House (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-14 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed |
2013-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-29 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-18 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2013-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-04 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMANCHE MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
OLD CELINA MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
VENABLE RANCH MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1 OF DENTON COUNTY
OLD CELINA MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
VENABLE RANCH MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1 OF DENTON COUNTY