TX HB3960 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to rate filings by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
Title
Relating to rate filings by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE RATES
Insurance--Property & Casualty
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
WINDSTORM INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, TEXAS
WINDSTORM INSURANCE LEGISLATIVE FUNDING & FUNDING STRUCTURE OVERSIGHT BOARD
INSURANCE RATES
Insurance--Property & Casualty
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
WINDSTORM INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, TEXAS
WINDSTORM INSURANCE LEGISLATIVE FUNDING & FUNDING STRUCTURE OVERSIGHT BOARD