TX HB3983 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to service retirement benefits payable by the Employees Retirement System of Texas to commissioned peace officers employed by the attorney general.
Title
Relating to service retirement benefits payable by the Employees Retirement System of Texas to commissioned peace officers employed by the attorney general.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1864 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Law Enforcement
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Law Enforcement
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3983 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03983I.htm |