TX HB4046 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Energy Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Energy Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reduction and plugging of orphaned oil and gas wells; providing for the imposition of a fee and an exemption from certain taxes and fees.
Title
Relating to the reduction and plugging of orphaned oil and gas wells; providing for the imposition of a fee and an exemption from certain taxes and fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1686 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1686 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1686 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
RAILROAD COMMISSION
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources