TX HB4088 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the rate of the motor vehicle sales and use tax imposed on certain motor vehicles.
Title
Relating to the rate of the motor vehicle sales and use tax imposed on certain motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB120 (Same As) 2009-02-10 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
HYBRID VEHICLES
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Energy--Alternative Fuels
HYBRID VEHICLES
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General