TX HB4088 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a hospital district governing board to conduct a closed meeting to deliberate certain issues.
Title
Relating to the authority of a hospital district governing board to conduct a closed meeting to deliberate certain issues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1960 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Hospitals
Open Meetings
Open Records
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Business & Commerce--General
Hospitals
Open Meetings
Open Records
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4088 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04088I.htm |