TX HB4103 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of certain tax revenue by certain municipalities and to the entitlement of certain municipalities to certain tax revenue related to a hotel and convention center project.
Title
Relating to the use of certain tax revenue by certain municipalities and to the entitlement of certain municipalities to certain tax revenue related to a hotel and convention center project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1641 (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Amended RV#602 (Y: 107 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amended RV#565 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Amended RV#602 (Y: 107 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amended RV#565 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-14 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1641 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#602 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-04-30 | House | Amended 5-P. King |
2021-04-30 | House | Amended 4-Morrison |
2021-04-30 | House | Amended 3-Paddie |
2021-04-30 | House | Amended 2-Bucy |
2021-04-30 | House | Amended 1-Moody and Clardy |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#565 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Amended 3-Wilson |
2021-04-29 | House | Amended 2-Reynolds |
2021-04-29 | House | Amended 1-C. Turner |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1649 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Committee report printed and distributed