TX HB4210 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to publication of notice requirements for certain governmental entities and representatives.
Title
Relating to publication of notice requirements for certain governmental entities and representatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
PUBLIC NOTICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
PUBLIC NOTICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4210 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04210I.htm |