TX HB4300 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Koop [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] |
Rep. Victoria Neave Criado [D] | Sen. Donald Huffines [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-05 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital