TX HB4400 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to create additional housing for certain individuals with an intellectual or developmental disability through a Medicaid waiver program.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to create additional housing for certain individuals with an intellectual or developmental disability through a Medicaid waiver program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR141 (Enabling for) 2019-04-23 - No action taken in committee
SB2251 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB2251 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
BONDS
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Housing
Housing--General
MEDICAID
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Housing
Housing--General
MEDICAID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4400 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04400I.htm |