TX HB4424 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exception to the titling requirement for certain motor vehicles; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to an exception to the titling requirement for certain motor vehicles; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2023-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB528 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Left pending in committee
SB528 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Left pending in committee
SB528 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
SALVAGE YARDS & SALVAGE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Crimes--Miscellaneous
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
SALVAGE YARDS & SALVAGE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General