TX HB4429 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice of water and wastewater requirements for the foreclosure sale of residential properties by certain political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to notice of water and wastewater requirements for the foreclosure sale of residential properties by certain political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-28 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1924 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC NOTICE
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER & SEWER SERVICE
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC NOTICE
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER & SEWER SERVICE