TX HB4437 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of certain records containing applicant or student information that are held by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of certain records containing applicant or student information that are held by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#934 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#891 (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#891 (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#934 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#891 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2422 (Similar To) 2023-05-17 - Referred to Higher Education
SB2422 (Similar To) 2023-05-17 - Referred to Higher Education
SB2422 (Similar To) 2023-05-17 - Referred to Higher Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
RECORDS MANAGEMENT