TX HB4552 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to purchasing by the Department of Information Resources of information technology commodity items.
Title
Relating to purchasing by the Department of Information Resources of information technology commodity items.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2023-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1125 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1125 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1125 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce