TX HB4591 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the issuance of general obligation bonds to provide funding to develop and maintain research universities in this state of the highest tier.
Title
Relating to the issuance of general obligation bonds to provide funding to develop and maintain research universities in this state of the highest tier.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1 (Enabling for) 2009-05-06 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
BONDS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT