TX HB4711 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Committee report printed and distributed
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Committee report printed and distributed
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Hunt County Municipal Utility District No. 1; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Hunt County Municipal Utility District No. 1; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Deuell [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-24 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-03-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2457 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Subjects
HUNT COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility