TX HB4747 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the powers of the Westchase District.
Title
Relating to the powers of the Westchase District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-22 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-30 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-28 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-04-06 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-04-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2496 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
PARKING
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
WESTCHASE DISTRICT
PARKING
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
WESTCHASE DISTRICT