TX HB4773 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Summary
Relating to the creation of Chambers County Improvement District No. 2; providing authority to levy an assessment, impose a tax, and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of Chambers County Improvement District No. 2; providing authority to levy an assessment, impose a tax, and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-01 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-23 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-08 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-04-08 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-04-08 | Read first time | |
2009-04-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2511 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
CHAMBERS COUNTY IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 2
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous