TX HB4790 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Brown's Ranch Municipal Utility District No. 1 of Grayson County; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Brown's Ranch Municipal Utility District No. 1 of Grayson County; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-01 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-28 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-15 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2541 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
BROWN'S RANCH MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility