TX HB5018 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain payment recovery efforts by managed care organizations under Medicaid or the child health plan program.
Title
Relating to certain payment recovery efforts by managed care organizations under Medicaid or the child health plan program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2055 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB2055 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB2055 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID