TX HB5081 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Vet Affairs
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Vet Affairs
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain motor vehicle safety inspection fees.
Title
Relating to certain motor vehicle safety inspection fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1530 (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1479 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1479 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#1530 |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed |
2023-05-11 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1479 |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
VEHICLE INSPECTIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
VEHICLE INSPECTIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration