TX HB530 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the terminology used in statute to refer to intellectual disability.
Title
Relating to the terminology used in statute to refer to intellectual disability.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB362 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB362 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB362 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Family
Family--Child Protection
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Family
Family--Child Protection
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice