TX HB5308 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-12 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-12 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the dissolution of the McMullen County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Title
Relating to the dissolution of the McMullen County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2566 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
SB2566 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
SB2566 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
Subjects
MCMULLEN COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.