TX HB588 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a statewide disaster alert system.
Title
Relating to a statewide disaster alert system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1589 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Co-author authorized
SB1589 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Co-author authorized
SB1589 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Co-author authorized