TX HB600 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the districts for the election of members of the State Board of Education.
Title
Relating to the composition of the districts for the election of members of the State Board of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11 | |
2011-05-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2011-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-06 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-06 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-06 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-05 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-04-29 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-29 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-29 | Postponed | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-04-29 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-27 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Redistricting, Select | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-18 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-15 | Record vote | |
2011-04-15 | Passed | |
2011-04-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Amendment as amended tabled | |
2011-04-14 | Amendment amended | |
2011-04-14 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-04-14 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-14 | Postponed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-12 | Record vote | |
2011-04-12 | Calendars Committee rule adopted | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-01 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-04-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-01 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-04-01 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-01 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-04-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-01 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-25 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-25 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Redistricting | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Elections
Elections--General
GONZALES COUNTY
MILLS COUNTY
Redistricting
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
UPSHUR COUNTY
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Elections
Elections--General
GONZALES COUNTY
MILLS COUNTY
Redistricting
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
UPSHUR COUNTY