TX HB615 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring that certain tests required for the issuance of a driver's license or a commercial driver's license be conducted in English.
Title
Relating to requiring that certain tests required for the issuance of a driver's license or a commercial driver's license be conducted in English.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2011-04-04 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2011-03-31 | Subcommittee meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2011-03-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2011-03-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time | |
2011-01-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB615 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB00615I.htm |