TX HB690 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reimbursing public institutions of higher education for tuition and fee exemptions for certain military personnel and their dependents.
Title
Relating to reimbursing public institutions of higher education for tuition and fee exemptions for certain military personnel and their dependents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-10 - House - HB 690Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-10 | House | Passed |
2013-05-10 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Military & Veterans