TX HB707 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study on expanding recovery housing in this state.
Title
Relating to a study on expanding recovery housing in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#167 (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#167 (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-13 | House | Record vote RV#167 |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed |
2021-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholism & Drug Abuse
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Housing
Housing--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Housing
Housing--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse