TX HB71 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transportation of certain mental health patients.
Title
Relating to the transportation of certain mental health patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-13 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-03-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-21 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
Law Enforcement
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MEXICO
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Law Enforcement
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MEXICO
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous