TX HB74 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs in certain rural areas.
Title
Relating to certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs in certain rural areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - HB 74Third Reading House (Y: 90 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 74Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 74Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | House | Filed |