TX HB74 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-04 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-04 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the law governing the provision of state aid to certain local governments disproportionately affected by the granting of ad valorem tax relief to disabled veterans.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the law governing the provision of state aid to certain local governments disproportionately affected by the granting of ad valorem tax relief to disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#50 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-08-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-08-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-03 | House | Passed |
2017-08-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-08-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-08-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-07-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-07-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions