TX HB747 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the taking of a specimen of the breath or blood of a person arrested for an intoxication offense under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to the taking of a specimen of the breath or blood of a person arrested for an intoxication offense under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Gattis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-19 | Read first time | |
2009-01-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB261 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars