TX HB747 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duty of certain professionals to report child abuse or neglect.
Title
Relating to the duty of certain professionals to report child abuse or neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - HB 747Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees