TX HB857 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the penalty for certain outdoor burning violations.
Title
Relating to the penalty for certain outdoor burning violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-22 | Amended | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-02 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |
Subjects
BURNING & INCINERATORS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Environment
Environment--Air
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Environment
Environment--Air