TX HB881 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to a residential tenant's right to rescind a rental application or lease agreement.
Title
Relating to a residential tenant's right to rescind a rental application or lease agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-17 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-09 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |