TX HB887 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-09 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-09 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to safety measures to protect students participating in athletic activities sponsored or sanctioned by the University Interscholastic League.
Title
Relating to safety measures to protect students participating in athletic activities sponsored or sanctioned by the University Interscholastic League.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - HB 887Third Reading House (Y: 91 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment amended |
2013-05-07 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-07 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-07 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-06 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2013-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE