TX HB901 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to registration of a motor vehicle alleged to have been involved in a violation detected by a photographic traffic signal enforcement system.
Title
Relating to registration of a motor vehicle alleged to have been involved in a violation detected by a photographic traffic signal enforcement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB413 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNALS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNALS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration