TX HB998 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of property owners' association insurance by the FAIR Plan Association in certain areas.
Title
Relating to the provision of property owners' association insurance by the FAIR Plan Association in certain areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#199 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#199 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-05 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-04 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-14 | House | Record vote RV#199 |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed |
2023-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2023-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB741 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
SB741 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
SB741 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Fire, Allied Lines & Home
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
TEXAS FAIR PLAN ASSOCIATION
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Fire, Allied Lines & Home
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
TEXAS FAIR PLAN ASSOCIATION