TX HCR126 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 105-46)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 105-46)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of the Honorable Edmund Kuempel of Seguin.
Title
In memory of the Honorable Edmund Kuempel of Seguin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-29 | Read & adopted | |
2011-05-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-27 | Adopted | |
2011-05-27 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-03-30 | Filed |