TX HCR126 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Paying tribute to the life of World War II veteran Juan C. Marquez of El Paso and commemorating the posthumous presentation of his military awards.
Title
Paying tribute to the life of World War II veteran Juan C. Marquez of El Paso and commemorating the posthumous presentation of his military awards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-13 | House | Filed |