TX HCR126 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 3699.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 3699.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-28 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - Senate - Read & adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - House - Adopted RV#2266 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - Senate - Read & adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - House - Adopted RV#2266 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-28 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Adopted HB 3699 |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#2266 |
2023-05-28 | House | Adopted HB 3699 |
2023-05-28 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
City Government--Roads
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
City Government--Roads
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective