TX HCR98 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating May 2013 as Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month in Texas.
Title
Designating May 2013 as Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month in Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-04-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-04-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-29 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS AWARENESS MONTH
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates