TX HJR108 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize and regulate the possession, cultivation, and sale of cannabis.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize and regulate the possession, cultivation, and sale of cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR8 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
MARIHUANA
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR108 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00108I.htm |