TX HR1143 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 4, 2013, as Educational Technology Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing April 4, 2013, as Educational Technology Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Strama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EDUCATIONAL TECHNOLOGY DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates